Berg v. Guthart et al
Plaintiff: Robert Berg
Defendant: Gary S. Guthart, Marshall L. Mohr, Lonnie M. Smith, David J. Rosa, Mark J. Meltzer, Jerome J. McNamara, Augusto V. Castello, Salvatore J. Brogna, Colin Morales, Craig H. Barratt, Eric H. Halvorson, Amal M. Johnson, Alan J. Levy, Floyd D. Loop, Mark J. Rubash, George Stalk, Jr. and Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00515
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has determined that a scheduling conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 2/18/2016, is VACATED and will be reset, if appropriate, in the Court's order addressing Defendants' pending Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 94 ). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/16/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REDACTED ORDER denying 64 Motion to Dismiss. The court schedules this case for a Case Management Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 2/18/2016. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 2/11/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/16/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed on April 23, 2015 (Docket Item No. 83), the court has determined that a Case Management Conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for April 30, 2015 is VACATED and will be re-set, if necessary, upon resolution of the pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/27/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/23/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. After considering the parties' arguments in the Joint Case Management Conference Statement, and reviewing judicial opinions on the topic, disclosure and discovery are stayed until further order of the court. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/7/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE: LETTERS FROM COUNSEL. Counsel shall not file any further letters on the docket for this or any related action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; granting 29 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 31 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; granting 31 Motion to Consolidate Cases signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on July 30, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. Guthart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Berg
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Herkenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary S. Guthart
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall L. Mohr
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie M. Smith
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Rosa
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Meltzer
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome J. McNamara
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusto V. Castello
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore J. Brogna
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Morales
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig H. Barratt
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Halvorson
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amal M. Johnson
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan J. Levy
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd D. Loop
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Rubash
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Stalk, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Jo W. Golub
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?