Hannan v. Tulving et al
Plaintiff: |
Victor Hannan |
Defendant: |
The Tulving Company, Inc. and Hannes Tulving, Jr. |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv01054 |
Filed: |
March 6, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
San Francisco |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward J. Davila |
Presiding Judge: |
Howard R. Lloyd |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
7 U.S.C. ยง 6 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 14, 2014 |
Filing
56
ORDER by Judge James Donato terminating 51 Stipulation; granting 55 Stipulation for Preliminary Injunction and Order (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
|
April 2, 2014 |
Filing
42
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Having reviewed Plaintiff's Status Statement filed April 2, 2014 (see Docket Item No. 41), the court finds good cause to continue the hearing on the Order to Show C ause re: Preliminary Injunction. Accordingly, the hearing currently scheduled for April 4, 2014, is CONTINUED to 11:00 a.m. on April 25, 2014.The temporary restraining order issued March 10, 2014, is EXTENDED in its entirety to 5:00 p.m. on April 25, 2014. Plaintiff shall file the anticipated Motion to Authorize Service of Defendants by Alternative Means on or before April 9, 2014, at which time it will be submitted for decision without a hearing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/2/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
|
April 1, 2014 |
Filing
40
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE STATUS STATEMENT. On or before 12:00 p.m. on 4/2/2014, Plaintiff shall file a brief status statement updating the court on the following issues. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/1/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing
37
ORDER RE: BANKRUPTCY STAY. This action is STAYED in favor of bankruptcy proceedings as to all claims asserted against Defendant The Tulving Company, Inc. until further order of the court. This action shall continue to proceed on all claims asserted against Defendant Hannes Tulving, Jr. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/18/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing
33
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/18/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. ***3/17/2014 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/14/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?