Bao v. SolarCity Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tai Jan Bao
Defendant: SolarCity Corporation, Lyndon R. Rive and Robert D. Kelly
Case Number: 5:2014cv01435
Filed: March 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DENYING 91 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND THE JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/6/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING 81 MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/9/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING 69 MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 58 MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended complaint due no later than 6/19/2015. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 4/27/2015.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL re 14 , 35 . James Webb is appointed as lead plaintiff. Within seven (7) days from the date of this order, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a stipulated schedule setting forth deadli nes for lead plaintiff to file an amended complaint, for Defendants to respond to the amended complaint, and for the parties to brief Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bao v. SolarCity Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tai Jan Bao
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarCity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndon R. Rive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?