Feitelson et al v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Gary Feitelson and Daniel McKee
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv02007
Filed: May 1, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2015 55 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Gary Feitelson, Daniel McKee (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 2, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing re 54 Order on Stipulation Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
March 2, 2015 54 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING 53 STIPULATION TO SET SCHEDULE RE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2015.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 27, 2015 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SET SCHEDULE RE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Google Inc.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 20, 2015 52 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. The amended pleading shall be due within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 2/20/2015.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
January 23, 2015 51 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 50 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 1/23/2015.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 22, 2015 50 Featured Case MOTION ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 2/5/2015. Replies due by 2/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 13, 2015 49 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/2014, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 48 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2015. (Related documents(s) 48 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
December 23, 2014 48 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Weingarten, James) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 47 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Gary Feitelson, Daniel McKee for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 18, 2014 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion to Dismiss Hearing held on 12/18/2014. The Court takes matter under submission. The Court order the Initial Case Management Conference set for 01/22/2015 continued to 03/26/2015 at 1:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2015. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Lopez. Defendant Attorney: Brian Rocca, John Schmidtlein, Jonathan Pitt, Sujal Shah. Attachment: Civil Minutes.(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2014)
December 3, 2014 45 NOTICE by Google Inc. Of Change Of Law Firm Affiliation (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
November 12, 2014 44 Featured Case ORDER Granting 43 Amended Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint and Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 11/12/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 11, 2014 43 Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing on Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint and Case Management Conference (Local Rule 6-2) filed by Google Inc. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 11/11/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 42 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing on Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint and Case Management Conference (Local Rule 6-2) filed by Google Inc.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2014 41 Defendant Google Inc.'s Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint (re 38 Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed by Google Inc.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 11/7/2014) Modified on 11/10/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2014 40 CLERK'S NOTICE AND ORDER RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING: Motion to Dismiss Hearing RESCHEDULED for 11/19/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3,5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 17, 2014 39 PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (re 38 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byGary Feitelson, Daniel McKee. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/17/2014) Modified on 10/22/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2014 38 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 11/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint) (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/19/2014) Modified on 9/19/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/22/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2014 37 Order granting 35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Howard. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/16/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 16, 2014 36 Order granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Simon Bahne Paris. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/16/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 15, 2014 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Patrick Howard ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8919972.) filed by Gary Feitelson, Daniel McKee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Howard, Patrick) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Simon Bahne Paris ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8919839.) filed by Gary Feitelson, Daniel McKee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Paris, Simon) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART 32 PARTIES' STIPULATION RE SCHEDULING; TERMINATING 28 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 7, 2014 32 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS RE GOOGLE INC.S RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (LOCAL RULE 6-2) filed by Google Inc. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 8/7/2014) Text modified on 8/8/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2014 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc.. Filed byGary Feitelson, Daniel McKee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 16, 2014 30 Order granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Hill B. Wellford. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/16/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 29 Order granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jon R. Roellke. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/16/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 11, 2014 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; (PROPOSED) Ordern filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/11/2014. Replies due by 9/2/2014. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/14/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2014 27 APPLICATION and (Proposed) Order FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY Hill B. Wellford to appear PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8761251.) filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wellford, Hill) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/14/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2014 26 APPLICATION and (Proposed) Order FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY Jon R Roellke to appear PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8761161.) filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Roellke, Jon) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/14/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER Granting Applications For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice re 20 , 21 , 22 . Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/28/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 22, 2014 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Sujal Shah (Shah, Sujal) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Michael Stoll on behalf of John E. Schmidtlein, Jonathan B. Pitt, James H. Weingarten, and Benjamin M. Stoll (Stoll, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jonathan B. Pitt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8638666.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pitt, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice James H. Weingarten ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8638602.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weingarten, James) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Benjamin M. Stoll ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8638525.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stoll, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 21, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 STIPULATION TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court adopts the briefing schedule set forth in the stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/21/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 20, 2014 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Google Inc.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 17 Certificate of Interested Entities and Disclosure Statement by Google Inc. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 5/20/2014) Modified on 5/21/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2014 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Rocca (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 12, 2014 15 Order granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by George W. Sampson. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/12/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 14 Order granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Robert F. Lopez. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/12/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 13 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Google, Inc (via Becky DeGeorge - Authorized Agent of CSC-Lawyers) on 5/5/2014 by Gary Feitelson, Daniel McKee (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/12/2014) Text modified on 5/12/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 12 Application for Admission of Attorney Robert F. Lopez for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice; and ( roposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8603796.) filed by Gary Feitelson, Daniel McKee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 11 Application for Admission of Attorney George W. Sampson for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice; and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8603787.) filed by Gary Feitelson, Daniel McKee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sampson, George) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2014 10 Order granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Steve W. Berman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/6/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 2, 2014 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8585886.) filed by Gary Feitelson, Daniel McKee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 8 Summons Issued as to Google Inc. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, US District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California 95113.. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/2/14. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 6 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 5/1/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 1, 2014 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gary Feitelson, Daniel McKee.. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 3 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8581747.). Filed byGary Feitelson, Daniel McKee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feitelson et al v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Feitelson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: George W. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McKee
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: George W. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Bradley Pitt
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Stoll
Represented By: James Harris Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?