Mil-Spec Monkey, Inc. v. Activision Blizzard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mil-Spec Monkey, Inc.
Defendant: Activision Blizzard, Inc. and Activision Publishing Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv02361
Filed: May 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 51 DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/11/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE: WRITTEN DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/15/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2014 11:00 AM to be held telephonically; Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2015 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 8/10/2015 09:00; Jury Trial set for 8/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/21/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mil-Spec Monkey, Inc. v. Activision Blizzard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Blizzard, Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Publishing Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mil-Spec Monkey, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W. Ballesteros
Represented By: Patrick N Lundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?