Strome v. DBMK Enterprises, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Strome
Defendant: DBMK Enterprises, Inc, Michael Sanchez, Debra Ann Sanchez and Vincent Sanchez
Case Number: 5:2014cv02398
Filed: May 23, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 13 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
July 11, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending briefing schedule and hearing date on motion to dismiss.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/11/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
August 12, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving request for leave to file a joint opposition.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/12/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
September 9, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS 28 22 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 30, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/30/14. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
November 19, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
February 5, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Motions terminated: 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by LELJ, Inc., Jennifer Strome.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/5/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strome v. DBMK Enterprises, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Strome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBMK Enterprises, Inc
Represented By: Philip J. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sanchez
Represented By: Philip J. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Ann Sanchez
Represented By: Philip J. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.