Cisco Systems Inc v. STMicroelectronics Inc
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems Inc
Defendant: STMicroelectronics Inc
Case Number: 5:2014cv03236
Filed: July 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF FINAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/31/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/16/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/13/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/26/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 146 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER re 142 Further Case Management Conference Minutes. It is hereby ordered that a Further Case Management Conference is set for 9/16/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/27/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of STMicroelectronics, Inc.'s Counter-Complaint. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 105 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF). (Filed on 9/1/2015).
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER 109 to Extend Time to Submit Evidence in Support of Plaintiff Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER 103 Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/26/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER 85 Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/30/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER 76 to Extend Time to Submit Evidence in Support of Plaintiff Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 29 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 51 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 53 Motion for Leave to File (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Approving 41 Joint Request to Remove Individuals Erroneously Listed as Defendants on Docket. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/8/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Dismiss; denying 38 Motion to Strike (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER 31 to Extend Time to Submit Evidence in Support of Plaintiff Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/23/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER 18 Re: Scheduling, Motions terminated: 11 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by STMicroelectronics Inc, 13 MO TION to Strike DEFENDANT STMICROELECTRONICS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND, THIRD, FIFTH, AND SIXTH CAUSES OF ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16; MEMORANDUM O filed by STMicroelectronics Inc.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/20/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER 16 Setting Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Special Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/14/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisco Systems Inc v. STMicroelectronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STMicroelectronics Inc
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?