Gregoria Amaya v. Rose International Market, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Gregoria Amaya |
Defendant: |
Rose International Market, Inc., Saied Mehranfar and Javad M. Mehranfar |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv03331 |
Filed: |
July 23, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
Santa Clara |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward J. Davila |
Presiding Judge: |
Howard R. Lloyd |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 2 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 6, 2015 |
Filing
43
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/6/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
18
ORDER RE: CONSENT/DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. On February 24, 2015, Defendants Javad Mehranfar, Saied Mehranfar, and Rose International Market, Inc. filed a document indicating their voluntary consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this action. See Docket Item No. 17 . In order to determine the position of both parties on this issue, the court orders Plaintiff to file a similar document indicating either her consent or declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge on or before March 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
|
January 15, 2015 |
Filing
11
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff complied with this order and has demonstrated good cause to preclude dismissal. See Docket Item No. 9 . Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/15/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
|
January 6, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The 120-day period for service provided by Rule 4(m) expired on November 20, 2014. Accordingly, the court issues the instant Order to Show Cause ("OSC") requiring that Plaintiff, no later than January 13, 2015, eith er: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on defendants; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Plaintiff is notified that the court will dismiss this action if Plaintiff fails to comply with this OSC or otherwise fails to show good cause as directed above. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/6/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?