VIA Technologies, Inc. (a California corporation) et al v. ASUS Computer International et al
Plaintiff: VIA Technologies, Inc. (a California corporation), VIA Technologies, Inc. (a Taiwan corporation) and VIA Labs, Inc.
Defendant: ASUS Computer International, ASUSTEK Computer, Inc. and ASMEDIA Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv03586
Filed: August 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER REGARDING 260 261 262 266 267 268 269 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/19/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER GRANTING 298 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REQUEST PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 5, 2017 SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/11/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING 259 263 265 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/5/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER GRANTING 247 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/5/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 217 , 218 , 231 , 239 MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/28/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING 200 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/7/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 190 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re: Dkt. No. 183 , Discovery Dispute Joint Report #3. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re: Dkt. No. 177 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS IN U.S. PATENT NO. 7,313,187. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/19/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 151 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF MIGUEL GOMEZ by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 124 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER RE: 148 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 5, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AND MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION OF 139 SEALING ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 140 ; granting 143 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RE: 140 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 28, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 117 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER RESCHEDULING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/11/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE RE SERVICE UPON ASUSTEK COMPUTER, INC., re ECF No. 87-3. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/15/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Dismiss. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER CONTINUING case management conference to August 27, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/1/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER:VACATING February 19, 2015, hearing;SUBMITTING 35 for consideration on the papers; andGRANTING 35 MOTION to Set Aside Default.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/3/2015.(blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE (Asustek Computer Inc.), re 29 Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/4/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIA Technologies, Inc. (a California corporation) et al v. ASUS Computer International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIA Technologies, Inc. (a California corporation)
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Represented By: Irene Y. Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Jean Young Rhee
Represented By: Stanley Hugh Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew D. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIA Technologies, Inc. (a Taiwan corporation)
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Represented By: Irene Y. Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Jean Young Rhee
Represented By: Stanley Hugh Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew D. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIA Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Represented By: Irene Y. Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Jean Young Rhee
Represented By: Stanley Hugh Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew D. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASUS Computer International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASUSTEK Computer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASMEDIA Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?