R. Andre Klein v. Timothy D. Cook, et al
Plaintiff: R. Andre Klein
Defendant: Timothy D. Cook, William V. Campbell, Millard ("Mickey") Drexler, Arthur D. Levinson, Robert A. Iger, Andrea Jung, Fred D. Anderson, Estate of Steven P. Jobs and Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv03634
Filed: August 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER REOPENING CASE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE CLERK SHALL REOPEN THE CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/17/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice 35 Motion to Dismiss. This action is STAYED in its entirety until the Santa Clara County Superior Court determines whether or not plaintiffs in the State Consolidated Action Case Number 1-14-CV-262174, can sufficiently plead demand futility, or until further order of this court. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this file. Plaintiff and Defendants shall submit a brief Joint Status Report apprising the court of the status of the state court action on 8/28/2015 and continuing every three months thereafter. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/22/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE: HEARING ON MAY 14, 2015. With regard to the hearing scheduled for May 14, 2015 in the above-entitled action, the court orders as follows: 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket Item No. 35 ) is suitable for decision without o ral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, that motion is SUBMITTED and counsel need not present further argument as to that motion. 2. The court will hear argument addressing Defendants' Motion to Stay (Docket Item No. 50 ). Counsel shall prepare their presentations in accord with these directions. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/12/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 41 Joint Case Management Statement filed by R. Andre Klein. The court finds that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for January 22, 2015 is continued to 10:00 a.m. on June 18, 2015. The parties shall file an updated joint case management conference Statement (of no more than 10 pages)on or before June 11, 2015. Furthermore, after considering the parties' arguments in the Joint Case Management Statement, and reviewing judicial opinions on the topic, disclosure and discovery are stayed until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/16/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. Andre Klein v. Timothy D. Cook, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Andre Klein
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William V. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard ("Mickey") Drexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur D. Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Iger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred D. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Steven P. Jobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?