Western World Insurance Company v. Nonprofits Insurance Alliance of California
Plaintiff: Western World Insurance Company
Defendant: Nonprofits Insurance Alliance of California
Case Number: 5:2014cv04466
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF'S LEAD COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Judge Edward J. Davila Granting in Part and Denying in Part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER VACATING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE. In light of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment, the trial setting conference scheduled for June 2, 2016, is VACATED and will be reset, if necessary, upon resolution of the motions. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/31/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL ORDER (BENCH). Based on the parties' Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement and proposed schedule, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 10/1/2015 Trial Setting Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: The parties may file two sets of cross-motions for summary judgment, one addressing each underlying action. The parties' request for separate trials will be addressed at the Fina l Pretrial Conference. Fact Discovery cutoff 11/10/2015. Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2015. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Final Pretrial Con ference Statement and Motions in Limine due by 3/24/2016. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due 3/28/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Bench Trial set for 4/25/2016, 4/26/2016, 4/27/2016, 4/28/2016, 4/29/2016 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/28/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015) Modified text on 9/28/2015 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western World Insurance Company v. Nonprofits Insurance Alliance of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: David Arthur Evans
Represented By: James Lucken Wraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nonprofits Insurance Alliance of California
Represented By: GailAnn Y Stargardter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?