Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Metrotech Solutions USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Defendant: Metrotech Solutions USA Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv04871
Filed: November 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re 52 Joint Discovery Letter of December 1, 2017. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 to Extend Deadline to Complete Mediation filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 1/18/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 to Continue Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Responses due by 8/3/2017. Replies due by 8/10/2017. Motion Hearing reset for 8/24/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/11/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt. Responses due by 7/13/2017. Replies due by 7/20/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/20/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Metrotech Solutions USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Nicole L Drey
Represented By: Christopher Quang Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metrotech Solutions USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?