Hernandez v. San Mateo County Community College District (Canada College)
Plaintiff: Gerardo Hernandez
Defendant: San Mateo County Community College District (Canada College)
Case Number: 5:2014cv05317
Filed: December 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/19/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE 25 COURT-ENFORCABLE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/25/2016 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO MEDIATE UNDER GENERAL ORDER 56 Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/18/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR JOINT INSPECTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/12/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. San Mateo County Community College District (Canada College)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Hernandez
Represented By: Catherine M. Cabalo
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County Community College District (Canada College)
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Meola
Represented By: Kristina Michelle Paszek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?