Goes International, AB v. Dodur Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Goes International, AB
Defendant: Dodur Ltd., Zhou Ming and Li Zhe
Case Number: 5:2014cv05666
Filed: December 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING 138 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/20/2018)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 121 Motion to Strike Answer and Impose Sanctions. The court directs the clerk of court to enter the defendant's default. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
February 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/9/2017 09:30 AM. The attached order sets a hearing on 3/9/2017 at 9:30 a.m. (as opposed to the previously scheduled 11:00 hearing) for Dodur to show cause why it has not responded to the co urt's discovery order and why it has not named new counsel to represent it. The order authorizes telephone appearances by all parties and sets forth the procedures for arranging telephone participation. The order also requires counsel for Goes and previous counsel for Dodur to serve Dodur and to file proof of service within two business days. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 2/26/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 104 Motion to Compel. Dodur must, among other things, substitute new counsel into this case by February 6, 2017. See the attached order for further directions. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER RE APPROVAL FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE: Re 91 Proposed Order filed by Goes International, AB. Counsel to make arrangements through CourtCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/14/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 69 Motion to Compel. The court grants the plaintiff's motion to compel the requested discovery. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE: Re 78 Proposed Order filed by Goes International, AB. Counsel to make arrangements through CourtCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/27/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO AUTHORIZED TRANSCRIBER TO PRODUCE TRANSCRIPT OF FTR RECORD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/17/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court grants the motion to dismiss the individual defendants for lack of personal jurisdiction and denies the motion to dismiss Dodur.
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS LI ZHE AND ZHOU MING BY EMAIL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/16/2015.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goes International, AB v. Dodur Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goes International, AB
Represented By: Scott Michael Lesowitz
Represented By: Erik Swen Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodur Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhou Ming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li Zhe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?