Goes International, AB v. Dodur Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: |
Goes International, AB |
Defendant: |
Dodur Ltd., Zhou Ming and Li Zhe |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv05666 |
Filed: |
December 30, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
Outside US |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurel Beeler |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. § 501 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 20, 2018 |
Filing
153
ORDER GRANTING 138 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/20/2018)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing
128
ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 121 Motion to Strike Answer and Impose Sanctions. The court directs the clerk of court to enter the defendant's default. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
|
February 26, 2017 |
Filing
116
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/9/2017 09:30 AM. The attached order sets a hearing on 3/9/2017 at 9:30 a.m. (as opposed to the previously scheduled 11:00 hearing) for Dodur to show cause why it has not responded to the co urt's discovery order and why it has not named new counsel to represent it. The order authorizes telephone appearances by all parties and sets forth the procedures for arranging telephone participation. The order also requires counsel for Goes and previous counsel for Dodur to serve Dodur and to file proof of service within two business days. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 2/26/2017)
|
January 12, 2017 |
Filing
109
ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 104 Motion to Compel. Dodur must, among other things, substitute new counsel into this case by February 6, 2017. See the attached order for further directions. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
|
March 14, 2016 |
Filing
94
ORDER RE APPROVAL FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE: Re 91 Proposed Order filed by Goes International, AB. Counsel to make arrangements through CourtCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/14/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
|
February 4, 2016 |
Filing
84
ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 69 Motion to Compel. The court grants the plaintiff's motion to compel the requested discovery. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing
79
ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE: Re 78 Proposed Order filed by Goes International, AB. Counsel to make arrangements through CourtCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/27/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
|
December 17, 2015 |
Filing
66
ORDER TO AUTHORIZED TRANSCRIBER TO PRODUCE TRANSCRIPT OF FTR RECORD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/17/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
51
Order granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court grants the motion to dismiss the individual defendants for lack of personal jurisdiction and denies the motion to dismiss Dodur.
|
April 16, 2015 |
Filing
13
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS LI ZHE AND ZHOU MING BY EMAIL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/16/2015.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?