Gia Zamudio-Soto, et al v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gia Soto-Zamudio and Fernando Soto
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG and Bayer Oy
Case Number: 5:2015cv00209
Filed: January 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 90 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 91 92 93 Motions to Exclude Testimony as Moot. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Order Regarding Discovery Disputes. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 06/24/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Order Regarding Discovery Disputes. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 04/06/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/02/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 8/20/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 04/29/2015. (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gia Zamudio-Soto, et al v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alicia J. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Oy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gia Soto-Zamudio
Represented By: Elise Rochelle Sanguinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Soto
Represented By: Elise Rochelle Sanguinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?