United States Of America et al v. Morpho S.A., et al
Plaintiff: United States of America, State of California, Vincent Hascoet and Philippee Pacaud Desbois
Defendant: Safran Group, S.A., Morpho S.A. and Safran U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv00746
Filed: February 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in part 99 Motion for Attorney Fees.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 85 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying 78 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Re: Stay of Discovery. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 20, 2017. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 45 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America et al v. Morpho S.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Frederick Wayne Acker
Represented By: Suneeta Daisy Fernandes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Hascoet
Represented By: Daniel Robert Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philippee Pacaud Desbois
Represented By: Daniel Robert Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safran Group, S.A.
Represented By: Paul Benedict Salvaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morpho S.A.
Represented By: Paul Benedict Salvaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safran U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Paul Benedict Salvaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?