Keilch v. Romero et al
Plaintiff: Flora Keilch
Defendant: Suenia Romero and Marshell Terry-Battle
Case Number: 5:2015cv01526
Filed: April 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 63 Motion for Sanctions. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/1/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER to File A Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/30/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 52 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE: CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 6, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/20/2016. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 9, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE: JUVENILE CASE RECORDS re 17 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 8, 2015 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keilch v. Romero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suenia Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshell Terry-Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Keilch
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?