Estate of Robert Renzel, Deceased et al v. Ventura et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Robert Renzel, Deceased, Robert E. Renzel Trust, Susan Carter, Ann Renzel Sebastian and Bascom Avenue Development, LLC
Defendant: Lupe Ventura, Celia Ventura, Alfredo Torres, Carmen Torres, Hang Bae Whang, Seon Geun Whang, Kyu Chuk Whang, Kwang Kuk Park, Soon Ja Park, Chong K. Byun, Uktae Han, Mija Han, Thu Huynh, Noc T.B. Tran, Lien T. Nguyen, Thien D. Nguyen, Kiet Tran and Gary Tran
Case Number: 5:2015cv01648
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9659
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER GRANTING 324 Request for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a) (2). ***Civil Case Terminated.***Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/23/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER Re 318 Joint Application For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Establishment Of The Bascom Remediation Trust. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/17/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 316 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 313 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 300 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER GRANTING 286 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 284 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Hearing on Order to Show Cause. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 227 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE. Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/31/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 174 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS CARMEN AND ALFREDO TORRES'S 187 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2018 and Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting re 100 Defendants Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/10/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 87 Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference filed by Defendants' Carmen Torres, Alfredo Torres. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 81 Request for Substitution of Counsel for Han Defendants. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/31/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies discussed in this order within 14 days. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 59 Proposed Order, filed by Carmen Torres, Alfredo Torres. Joint Case Management Statement and [Proposed] Case Management Order due by 4/5/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/24/2015. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Defendants' Alfredo Torres, Carmen Torres (individuals and dba Ritz Cleaners) Request to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference on 11/20/2015. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/12/2015. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephone appearance. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, granting 32 . Plaintiff has until 11/20/2015 to amend, file and serve First Amended Complaint. Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2015 at 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2015. In the interim only written discovery is permitted. Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 9/14/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, granting 31 . N. Kathleen Strickland, Devin C. Courteau and Stephan Choo of Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley are substituted in as counsel of record for Defendants Hyang Bae Whang, Seon Geun Whang, and Kyu Chuk Whang in the place and stead the Defendants appearing as Pro Se. Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 9/10/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Robert Renzel, Deceased et al v. Ventura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Robert Renzel, Deceased
Represented By: Bret Adam Stone
Represented By: Kirk Matthew Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Renzel Trust
Represented By: Bret Adam Stone
Represented By: Kirk Matthew Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Carter
Represented By: Bret Adam Stone
Represented By: Kirk Matthew Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Renzel Sebastian
Represented By: Bret Adam Stone
Represented By: Kirk Matthew Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bascom Avenue Development, LLC
Represented By: Bret Adam Stone
Represented By: Kirk Matthew Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupe Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celia Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hang Bae Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seon Geun Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyu Chuk Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwang Kuk Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soon Ja Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chong K. Byun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uktae Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mija Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thu Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noc T.B. Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lien T. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thien D. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiet Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?