ASUS Computer International et al v. InterDigital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ASUS Computer International and ASUSTeK Computer Inc
Defendant: InterDigital, Inc., InterDigital Communications, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation, IPR Licensing, Inc. and InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv01716
Filed: April 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER RE: ECF 383 and 384 THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL EXHIBITS TO JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/28/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 OMNIBUS ORDER RE SEALING MOTIONS AT ECF 276 , 278 , 326 , 327 , 336 , AND 350 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/16/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 OMNIBUS ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTIONS AT 318 AND 319 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/1/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING 191 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING 111 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/16/2016.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 94 , 108 SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/1/2016. blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016) Modified on 9/1/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO MODIFY DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/15/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 27, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/15/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 37 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF ARBITRATION; (2) DENYING 45 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; (3) DENYING AS MOOT 67 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/25/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REGARDING REDACTION OF 90 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/25/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON 37 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/12/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON 45 PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Responses due by 6/22/2015. Replies due by 6/24/2015. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/17/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/15/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/17/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASUS Computer International et al v. InterDigital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASUS Computer International
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: David Giardina
Represented By: Brian R Nester
Represented By: Ezekiel Lee Rauscher
Represented By: M. Patricia Thayer
Represented By: Anna Mayergoyz Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASUSTeK Computer Inc
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: David Giardina
Represented By: Brian R Nester
Represented By: Ezekiel Lee Rauscher
Represented By: M. Patricia Thayer
Represented By: Anna Mayergoyz Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterDigital, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brett Levin
Represented By: Matthew Robert Reed
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: David Sidney Steuer
Represented By: Lucy Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterDigital Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brett Levin
Represented By: Matthew Robert Reed
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: David Sidney Steuer
Represented By: Lucy Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterDigital Technology Corporation
Represented By: Michael Brett Levin
Represented By: Matthew Robert Reed
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: David Sidney Steuer
Represented By: Lucy Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPR Licensing, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brett Levin
Represented By: Matthew Robert Reed
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: David Sidney Steuer
Represented By: Lucy Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brett Levin
Represented By: Matthew Robert Reed
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: David Sidney Steuer
Represented By: Lucy Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?