Peasley v. Spearman, et al
Plaintiff: David Scott Peasley
Case Number: 5:2015cv01769
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 239 Motion for Leave to File Second Summary Judgment Motion; granting 242 Administrative Motion For Leave to File Late Opposition to Motion for Leave. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, granting ECF No. 232 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/26/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Order Granting 197 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/19/2018. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 191 Motion to Set Aside Default and Denying as Moot 159 Motion for Default Judgment. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying in part 197 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 197 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 203 Stipulation. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. The parties continue to discuss settlement issues. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/12/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peasley v. Spearman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scott Peasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?