Crandall v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Craig Crandall
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation and Thuer Family Partnership
Case Number: 5:2015cv01828
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Bench Trial set for 6/18/2018 to 6/20/2018 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/22/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/8/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re 28 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 31, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crandall v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Crandall
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Shane Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thuer Family Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?