Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. BayOne Real Estate Investment Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: BayOne Real Estate Investment Corporation and Jinsong Guo
Case Number: 5:2015cv02248
Filed: May 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 70 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/19/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE RE PLAINTIFF'S SUBPOENA TO CALIFORNIA BUREAU OF REAL ESTATE, re ECF Nos. 78 and 79 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/10/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING 75 MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/4/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ON 67 PARTIES' DISCOVERY DISPUTE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/27/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ON PARTIES' DISPUTE REGARDING THIRD PARTY DEPOSITION [62, 64] signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/17/2017. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 38 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/10/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (1) DISSOLVING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; AND (2) STRIKING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT SARAH HUANG'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RE-FILING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/2/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 23 RE: STRIKING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT SARAH HUANG'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Show Cause Response due by 11/16/2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/15/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. BayOne Real Estate Investment Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Paul Andrew Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BayOne Real Estate Investment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinsong Guo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?