State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Marentes et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Vincent Marentes and Liudmela Bichegkueva
Case Number: 5:2015cv02289
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 02/24/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
December 14, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRAL FOR RELATED CASE DETERMINATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/14/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
November 10, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss; denying 24 Motion to Strike; denying 27 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 32 Motion for Summary Judgment (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Marentes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Represented By: Stephen M. Hayes
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Marentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liudmela Bichegkueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?