AliphCom et al v. Fitbit, Inc.

Plaintiff: AliphCom and BodyMedia, Inc.
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv02579
Filed: June 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 47 MOTION TO STAY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
November 12, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joseph S. Grinstein (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 5, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 48 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Replies due by 11/9/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
October 15, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 48 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Responses due by 10/29/2015; Replies due by 11/5/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
September 9, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 STIPULATION Selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/9/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
July 15, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
June 30, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AliphCom et al v. Fitbit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AliphCom
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Tamar Lusztig
Represented By: Floyd G Short
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr.
Represented By: Genevieve Vose Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BodyMedia, Inc.
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Tamar Lusztig
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr.
Represented By: Genevieve Vose Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick S. Chung
Represented By: Josh A. Krevitt
Represented By: Quincy Lu
Represented By: Stuart Mattison Rosenberg
Represented By: Alison Roberta Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?