Powerteq, LLC v. Moton

Plaintiff: Powerteq, LLC
Defendant: Ashraf Moton
Case Number: 5:2015cv02626
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFERRED PORTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER; TRANSFERRING ACTION TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
February 8, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Notice of Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria Elena-James on 2/8/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 5, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AS PREMATURE AND REFERRING IN PART TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 7, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER; AFFORDING PARTIES LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY ON PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND VENUE ISSUES; CONTINUING HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE . To the extent Moton seeks dismissal for lack of personal jurisdiction and seeks dismissal or transfer for improper venue, the Court defers ruling thereon, affords the parties leave to conduct discovery, and sets the following supplemental brie fing schedule and hearing: a. No later than April 15, 2016, Powerteq shall file its supplemental opposition; b. No later than April 29, 2016, Moton shall file his supplemental reply; c. The hearing on the deferred portion of the motion is continu ed from January 22, 2016, to May 13, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. To the extent Moton seeks a transfer pursuant to § 1404(a), the motion is denied without prejudice. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 15, 2016, to June 17, 2016, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 10, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 7, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 2, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO NOTICE MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES. Defendant i s ordered to immediately submit a chambers copy of his answer and his motion to dismiss or transfer. Defendant is ordered to file, no later than December 9, 2015, a notice of motion in which the motion to dismiss or transfer is set for hearing on a Friday at least 35 days after November 23, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 18, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
October 28, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER; STRIKING DEFENDANT'S ANSWER; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Moton's motion to dismiss or transfer is st ricken. The answer to the complaint is stricken. Moton is directed to file his response(s) to the complaint, either pro se or through counsel admitted to practice in this District, no later than November 23, 2015. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 6, 2015, to January 15, 2016, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 28, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
August 11, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. J Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/11/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powerteq, LLC v. Moton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powerteq, LLC
Represented By: Robert Warren Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashraf Moton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?