Barrio Fiesta, LLC v. Northridge Foods International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Barrio Fiesta, LLC
Defendant: Northridge Foods International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv02669
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
March 1, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
September 22, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/22/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
July 16, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/16/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrio Fiesta, LLC v. Northridge Foods International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrio Fiesta, LLC
Represented By: James Cai
Represented By: Marc Christian Guedenet
Represented By: Andrew George Watters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northridge Foods International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?