Mujadadi-Turan v. Motorola Mobility, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Nia Mujadadi-Turan
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, LLC and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv02752
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/19/2017 10:00 AM, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Show Cause Response due by 1/12/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/2/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
August 22, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY) - SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS. Based on the parties Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Trial Setting Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule. The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for a settlement conference to occur no later than November 18, 2016. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Cousins Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date and time for the conference. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions In-Limine and Exchange of Exhibits due 5/18/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ed ward J. Davila. Jury Selection set for 6/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 6/14, 6/16, 6/20, 6/21/2017 09:00 AM. Jury deliberations 6/22, 6/23/2017 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
March 9, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Defendants to Respond filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Response due 4/4/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/9/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 10, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 42 Stipulation filed to Cont. Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Motorola Mobility, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Response due 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 8, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Defs. Motorola Mobility, LLC and Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. to Resp. to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Motorola Mobility, LLC. Response due 2/8/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/8/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
December 9, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation to Continue Deadline For Defendants Motorola Mobility, LLC and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Motorola Mobility, LLC. Response due 1/8/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/9/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
November 10, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 Fourth Joint Stipulation To Continue Deadline For Defendant Motorola Mobility, LLC To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Motorola Mobility, LLC. Response due 11/10/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/10/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 15, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 Stipulation to Continue Deadline For Metlife To Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Response due 11/10/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/15/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
September 11, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 21 Stipulation to Continue Deadline For Def. Motorola Mobility, LLC filed by Motorola Mobility, LLC. Response due 10/9/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/11/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mujadadi-Turan v. Motorola Mobility, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nia Mujadadi-Turan
Represented By: Beth Davis
Represented By: Andrew Michael Kantor
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles Andrew Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?