Douglas T Riggin v. Aims Operating Corp., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Douglas T. Riggin
Defendant: Aims Operating Corp., Inc. and Roadrek Motor Homes Inc
Case Number: 5:2015cv02773
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 12, 2016, re 63 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 5, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 5, 2016. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
February 2, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/2/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
November 3, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 23 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas T Riggin v. Aims Operating Corp., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aims Operating Corp., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrek Motor Homes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas T. Riggin
Represented By: Terry L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?