Merritt et al v. City of Sunnyvale et al

Plaintiff: Salma Merritt and David Merritt
Defendant: City of Sunnyvale, Rosemarie Zulueta, Trudi Ryan, John Howell, Hanson Hom, Chetak Gandhi, Wayne Brown, Ying-Chi Ying, Classics at Fair Oaks Homeowners' Association and Mozart Development Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv02775
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 66 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. The hearing scheduled for 3/23/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/20/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017) Modified on 3/20/2017 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 , 26 Motions to Dismiss; denying as moot 20 Motion to Require Plaintiffs to Furnish Security for Costs. Plaintiffs' motions to extend the time to file oppositions to the motions to dismiss 45 , 48 are DENIED. Judgment will be entered in favor of Defendants and the Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
July 26, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING. Because it will be addressed in the ensuing order on Defendants' motions to dismiss and for other relief, the hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to reschedule and to extend the time for briefing 48 scheduled for 7/28/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/26/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
September 23, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/6/2015 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/23/15. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merritt et al v. City of Sunnyvale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salma Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sunnyvale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemarie Zulueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudi Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chetak Gandhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ying-Chi Ying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classics at Fair Oaks Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mozart Development Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?