Taylor v. IDC Technologies, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Taylor
Defendant: IDC Technologies, Inc and First Advantage Background Services Corp
Case Number: 5:2015cv02929
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 81 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 83 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The court sets a case management conference for October 5, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. The parties' joint case management statement is due September 28, 2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 67 Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
October 30, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS CROSS-CLAIMS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 25 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
September 22, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re 38 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 22, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. IDC Technologies, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Taylor
Represented By: John G Albanese
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Represented By: Erin Amanda Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDC Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Advantage Background Services Corp
Represented By: Eric Michael Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?