Aaron v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Wanda Aaron
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, WebBank and Wells Fargo Financial National Bank
Case Number: 5:2015cv02951
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/24/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 23, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED re 16-802. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/23/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 19, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/19/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
January 22, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Exchange of Initial Disclosures and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/22/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
September 30, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 30, 2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
July 1, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/1/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Aaron
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Represented By: Alexander Marcus Porcaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?