Cobert v. Equifax Inc.

Plaintiff: Ira Cobert
Defendant: Equifax Inc., TransUnion LLC and HSBC Holdings plc
Case Number: 5:2015cv03016
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR STATUS UPDATE. Status Report due by 4/21/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/21/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
December 21, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT WITHIN 30 DAYS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/21/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
October 26, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JANUARY 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/26/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobert v. Equifax Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Cobert
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?