Alias v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Sabrena Alias
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, County Financial Services Barclay's Bank Delaware, Schools Financial Credit Union, Wells Fargo Financial National Bank and Asset Acceptance, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv03057
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 48 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Schools Financial Credit Unition filed by Sabrena Alias. Schools Financial Credit Union terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
November 10, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CORRECTING 34 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DISMISSING DEFENDANTS. The prior order dismissing Schools Financial is VACATED and it is reinstated as a defendant. County Financial is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 4( m). Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on Schools Financial. Since it is the only defendant remaining, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 12/10/2015. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 12/3/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/10/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 23, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Dismissal of Defendant GMAC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/23/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 20, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/19/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 1, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DISMISSING DEFENDANTS. The OSC is DISCHARGED as to GMAC Mortgage, LLC, and County Financial Services. All claims against TransUnion, LLC and Schools Financial Credit Union are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/1/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 23, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court issues the instant OSC requiring that Plaintiff, no later than 9/30/2015 either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on TransUnion, GMAC, County Financial, and Schools Financial; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/23/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
August 4, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court *** ORDER FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** Modified text on 8/4/2015 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation to Extend Time for Asset Acceptance to Respond to Complaint filed by Asset Acceptance, LLC. Response due 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/27/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 15, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 6 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Wells Fargo to Response to Initial Response filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint shall be continued to August 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/15/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alias v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrena Alias
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Represented By: Eric John Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Financial Services Barclay's Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schools Financial Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Represented By: Eric John Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance, LLC
Represented By: Liana Mayilyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?