Berrywiggins v. Wells Fargo N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Susan Berrywiggins
Defendant: Wells Fargo N.A. and Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP
Case Number: 5:2015cv03116
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/14/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
August 3, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/3/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 13, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/13/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrywiggins v. Wells Fargo N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Berrywiggins
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo N.A.
Represented By: Daniel A Armstrong
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?