Integris Wealth Management, LLC v. Integris Asset Management, LLC

Plaintiff: Integris Wealth Management, LLC
Defendant: Integris Asset Management, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv03142
Filed: July 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 9, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO PLAINTIFF. Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2016. Show Cause Response due by 12/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/9/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
September 24, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 12 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/24/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
August 10, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integris Wealth Management, LLC v. Integris Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integris Wealth Management, LLC
Represented By: Robert Warren Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integris Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?