Dang v. City Of San Jose

Plaintiff: Hoang Dang
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Case Number: 5:2015cv03177
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/4/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
June 14, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CMC 28 . Further Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Parties to file dismissal or updated case management statement by 7/20/2016. Further continuances are disfavored. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/14/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
November 9, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 14 . Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/9/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
October 5, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO CONTINUE CMC 6 . Updated Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/5/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dang v. City Of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoang Dang
Represented By: Dale Kristopher Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?