Distinct Media Limited v. Doe Defendants 1-50

Plaintiff: Distinct Media Limited
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Case Number: 5:2015cv03312
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $180,524.27. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
August 2, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE: MOTION FOR DEFAULT 46 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/2/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
December 11, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE. By 1/6/2016, Distinct Media must either identify a defendant, or show cause why the Court should not dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/11/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Distinct Media Limited v. Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Distinct Media Limited
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Amy McCowan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?