Penn Air Control Inc v. Bilbro Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Penn Air Control Inc
Defendant: Bilbro Construction Company, Inc. and International Fidelity Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv03327
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA RE: 40 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/30/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 23, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFIED ORDER GRANTING Motion to Continue Case Management Conference 38 . Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 2, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION to Continue 12/9/2015 Case Management Conference 31 . Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/2/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
October 8, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATON RE: WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 15 . Motion to Dismiss 10 set for 10/28/2015 is VACATED. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/8/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn Air Control Inc v. Bilbro Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn Air Control Inc
Represented By: Theodore Arthur Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilbro Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Dominick Lepiscopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter Dominick Lepiscopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?