Ruskell v. North County Fire Protection District of Monterey County et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Ruskell
Defendant: North County Fire Protection District of Monterey County and Chris Orman
Case Number: 5:2015cv03540
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/3/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
April 6, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 20 MOTION TO DISMISS PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/6/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
February 19, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND REVISED JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED DISCOVERY AND PRE-TRIAL CUTO-OFF DATES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/19/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
January 21, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 28 Initial Case Management Conference. Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 10/19/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 2/5/2018 at 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 2/5/2018 (Est. 5 days) at 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/21/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 12, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 23). Case Management Conference set for January 21, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/12/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruskell v. North County Fire Protection District of Monterey County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Ruskell
Represented By: Samantha Michelle Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North County Fire Protection District of Monterey County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Orman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?