Rodriguez et al v. City of San Jose et al

Plaintiff: Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Calguns Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: City Of San Jose, City of San Jose Police Department and Steven Valentine
Case Number: 5:2015cv03698
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
0 Judge: Edward J Davila
1 Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2017 58 USCA Case Number 17-17144 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #57 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Calguns Foundation, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 57 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11813760 paid.) w/ Representation Statement Attached (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 3, 2017 56 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/3/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
September 29, 2017 55 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #22 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING #28 PLAINTIFFS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Clerk shall close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
August 15, 2017 54 Letter Brief of Plaintiffs filed byCalguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 15, 2017 53 Letter Brief Ltr. Brief to Court Panzella filed byCity Of San Jose, City of San Jose Police Department, Steven Valentine. (Greenberg, Clifford) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 1, 2017 52 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #50 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LETTER BRIEF RE: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/1/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 26, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #50 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Notice of Supplemental Authority, Leave to File Letter Brief re: Panzella v. Sposato, et al., filed by Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Calguns Foundation, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 26, 2017 51 Proposed Order re #50 MOTION for Leave to File Letter Brief re: Panzella v. Sposato, et al., by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 7/26/2017) Modified on 7/26/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2017 50 MOTION for Leave to File Letter Brief re: Notice of supplemental authority Panzella v. Sposato, et al., filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2017. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 7/26/2017) Modified on 7/26/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2017 49 Letter Brief on Supplemental Authority re #48 Letter Brief, #47 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 5/30/2017) Modified on 5/31/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2017 48 Letter Brief re #47 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed byCity Of San Jose, City of San Jose Police Department, Steven Valentine. (Related document(s) #47 ) (Greenberg, Clifford) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 16, 2017 47 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #45 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRIEF RECENT DEVELOPMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/16/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 8, 2017 46 Proposed Order re #45 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION & Notice of Supplemental Authority by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 8, 2017 45 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION that the Court permit the parties to submit letter briefs & Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Responses due by 5/12/2017. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 5/8/2017) Modified on 5/8/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2016 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2016 re #22 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court heard oral argument. The Court took the matter under submission. Court to issue order. Plaintiff Attorney Don Kilmer. Defendant Attorney Clifford Greenberg. Total Time in Court:9:54-10:44am(50 Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. This is a text only Minute Entry (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/10/2016)
October 7, 2016 43 REPLY (re #28 OPPOSITION to Def's Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byCalguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
September 30, 2016 42 Statement Moving Responsive Separate Statement in Opposition to Cross MSJ by City Of San Jose, Steven Valentine. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 41 DECLARATION of Mark Vanni in Opposition to #40 Opposition/Response to Motion Cross MSJ filed byCity Of San Jose, Steven Valentine. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 40 RESPONSE (re #28 OPPOSITION to Def's Motion for Summary Judgment ) Cross-MSJ filed byCity Of San Jose, Steven Valentine. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 21, 2016 39 ERRATA re #36 Declaration in Opposition, Correct copies of Exhibits C and D by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 20, 2016 38 Featured Case ORDER re #34 Stipulation to extend time for plaintiff's filing of opposition and cross motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/20/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 16, 2016 37 Proposed Order Re: Summary Judgment by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 36 DECLARATION of Attorney Kilmer in Opposition to #35 Opposition/Response to Motion and in Support of Cross-Motion (Replaces Doc #33 ) filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #35 ) (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 35 OPPOSITION to (re #22 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 34 STIPULATION to extend time and substitute - Opposition to #22 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 33 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #36 Declaration of Donald Kilmer filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 32 RESPONSE Sep Statement of Facts in opposition to #22 Def's Motion for Summary Judgment and Separate Statement in support of cross-motion for summary judgment or partial summary adjudication filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 9/16/2016,(to conform with document posted by counsel. (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 31 Declaration of Lori Rodriguez in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposing #22 Def's Motion for Summary Judment filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 30 Declaration of Brandon Combs in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposing #22 Def's Motion for Summary Judment filed byCalguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 29 Declaration of Alan Gottlieb in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposing #22 Def's Motion for Summary Judment filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 28 OPPOSITION to #22 Def's Motion for Summary Judgment or partial summary adjudication and Plaintiff's CROSS-MOTION for summary judgment or partial summary adjudication filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/30/2016. Replies due by 10/7/2016. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified text on 9/16/2016, to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/16/2016 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2016 27 ERRATA Table of Authorities is missing a page number. That citation is found on page 6. re #22 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City Of San Jose, Steven Valentine. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 9/14/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2016 26 Proposed Order Granting City's #22 Motion for Summary Judgment by City Of San Jose, Steven Valentine. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 9/1/2016) Modified on 9/1/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2016 25 Moving Separate Statement of Material Facts and Evidence in support of #22 Motion for Summary Judgment by City Of San Jose, Steven Valentine. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 9/1/2016) Modified on 9/1/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2016 24 Request for Judicial Notice in support of #22 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by City Of San Jose, Steven Valentine. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 9/1/2016) Modified on 9/1/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2016 23 Declaration of MARK VANNI in support of #22 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by City Of San Jose, Steven Valentine. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 9/1/2016) Modified on 9/1/2016, Not Linked (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2016 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative MOTION for partial Summary Judgment filed by City Of San Jose, Steven Valentine. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/15/2016. Replies due by 9/22/2016. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 9/1/2016) Modified on 9/1/2016,( counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2016 21 Featured Case Order Granting #20 Stipulation re: Doe Defendants. The time foramendment of the pleadings for purposes of substitution of Doe Defendants ismodified to July 14, 2016. All other orders and deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/29/2016(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 28, 2016 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Doe Defendants filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
February 22, 2016 19 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Based on the parties' Joint Case Management Statement and proposed schedule, the Court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 2/25/2016 Case Management Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: The deadline for joinder of any additional parties, or other amendments to the pleadings, is sixty days after entry of this order. The parties' request for relief from the undersigneds standing order with respect to summary judgment briefing is DENIED. All motions for summary judgment, partial summary judgment or summary adjudication must comply with Section IV of the Standing Order for Civil Cases. Fact Discovery cutoff 7/1/2016. Deadline to File Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2016. Expert Discovery cutoff 10/28/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/19/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 16, 2016 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (for both parties) filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 11, 2016 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
January 20, 2016 16 NOTICE by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. Certificate of Initial Disclosure (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 11, 2016 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCity Of San Jose, City of San Jose Police Department, Steven Valentine. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
November 4, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 12 Featured Case ORDER granting #11 Stipulation TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ADR CERTIFICATION AND RULE 26(f)REPORT. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to February 25, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/4/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (revised after reassignment) filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 28, 2015 10 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains the Referral Judge for this case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 10/29/15. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 28, 2015 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 28, 2015 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City Of San Jose, City of San Jose Police Department.. (Vanni, Mark) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 21, 2015 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue Case Managment Conference and other due dates filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 21, 2015 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lori Rodriguez, Calguns Foundation, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Service waived by All Defendants. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
August 27, 2015 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Lori Rodriguez, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc... (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 13, 2015 4 Summons Issued as to City Of San Jose, City of San Jose Police Department, Steven Valentine. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 13, 2015 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2015 01:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 13, 2015 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 12, 2015 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9754005.). Filed byLori Rodriguez, Calguns Foundation, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 8/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Rodriguez
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calguns Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Represented By: Mark Vanni
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose Police Department
Represented By: Mark Vanni
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Valentine
Represented By: Mark Vanni
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?