Krasts v. Bell and Howell, LLC

Plaintiff: Alfs Krasts
Defendant: Bell and Howell, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv03701
Filed: August 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION AND DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 16, 2016, re 29 and denying 17 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 10, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 10, 2016, re 27 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
September 17, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 17, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krasts v. Bell and Howell, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfs Krasts
Represented By: Moira Collette McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell and Howell, LLC
Represented By: Neda N. Dal Cielo
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?