Chavez v. Converse, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Chavez
Defendant: Converse, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv03746
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part 179 Motion for Summary Judgment. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Re: Dkt. No. 169 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING CONVERSE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT CHAVEZ'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Re: Dkt. Nos. 118 , 124 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Re: Dkt. No. 55 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
July 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER EXTENDING CLASS CERTIFICATION REPLY BRIEFING AND PERMITTING ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY. Re: Dkt. Nos. 68 70 71 . Chavez's reply brief is due 8/15/2016. Class certification hearing is reset for 9/7/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/9/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2016)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR VIDEO PRESERVATION 40 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/21/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Converse, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Chavez
Represented By: Dennis Sangwon Hyun
Represented By: Larry W Lee
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Converse, Inc.
Represented By: Maya Harel
Represented By: Casey Jean Teele McCoy
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Meer
Represented By: Sheryl Lyn Skibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?