Spy Phone Labs LLC. v. Google Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Spy Phone Labs LLC.
Defendant: Google Inc. and Andrei Ciuca
Case Number: 5:2015cv03756
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 88 Joint MOTION to Dismiss ,Stipulation for Dismissal and Proposed Order filed by Spy Phone Labs LLC., Google Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/8/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
October 18, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Pleading Schedule and Case Management Conference filed by Spy Phone Labs LLC., Google Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/18/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 14, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Dismiss; denying 64 Motion to supplement. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
June 28, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 56 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff SpyPhone Labs LLC's Second Amended Complaint,. Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2016. Replies due by 8/7/2016. Responses du e by 7/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2016 at 01:30 PM. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/28/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 14, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/14/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
March 21, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO GOOGLE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 35 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spy Phone Labs LLC. v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spy Phone Labs LLC.
Represented By: Michael Alan Freeman
Represented By: Neil Arthur Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Patricia M. Graham
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: Barry Alan Werbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Ciuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?