Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc. v. Panasonic Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc. and Nebraska Dynamics, Inc.
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America, KOA Corporation, KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Yageo Corporation and Yageo America Corporation
Miscellaneous: Chip-Tech Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2015cv03820
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2017 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 10/3/2017. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/5/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
August 4, 2017 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/4/2017. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
September 19, 2016 215 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/19/2016. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
June 22, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiffs shall refile unredacted copies of their consolidated class action complaints, which will be publicly accessible, within 7 days of the date of this order. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
February 16, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 02/16/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
December 31, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/31/2015. The parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed stipulation to stay the matter by 1/8/2016; Parties comments to the proposed stipulation are due by 1/22/2016. The Court set a Further Case Management Conference for 1/29/2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6, 4th floor in San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2015)
December 21, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Following Case Management Conference.Relates to (67), (68), (69) motions to appoint interim lead counsel and (82) request for consolidation in case 5:15-cv-3820-RMW and (51) motion to appoint interim lead counsel in case 5:15-cv-03868-RMW. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
November 24, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 63 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 8, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 Notice (Other) filed by Chip-Tech Ltd.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/7/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc. v. Panasonic Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Joyce Chang
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Demetrius Xavier Lambrinos
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska Dynamics, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Ian L Papendick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOA Speer Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C. Murray
Represented By: Joshua Courtney Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murata Electronics North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROHM Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vishay Intertechnology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yageo Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yageo America Corporation
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Jessica Nicole Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Chip-Tech Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?