Ciganek v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al

Plaintiff: William Ciganek, Jr.
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Hunt & Henriques, Michael Scott Hunt and Janalie Ann Henriques
Case Number: 5:2015cv03837
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
February 12, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 12, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
October 8, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE SUA SPONTE FOR DETERMINATION OF RELATED CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/8/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ciganek v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ciganek, Jr.
Represented By: Raeon Rodrigo Roulston
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Topor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt & Henriques
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Topor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Hunt
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Topor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janalie Ann Henriques
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Topor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?