Stoelting v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Stoelting
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, American Express Company, Ford Motor Company, Omaha Service Center, Tri Counties Bank and WebBank
Case Number: 5:2015cv03857
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In order to allow the parties additional time to finalize settlement agreements and file dismissals, the Case Management Conference scheduled for January 21, 2016, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on March 3, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before February 25, 2016. Motions terminated: 50 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Initial Case Management Conference filed by WebBank. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/19/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 18, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 40 AMENDED Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lisa Stoelting as to Defendant American Express. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/18/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 4, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant American Express Company) filed by Lisa Stoelting. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
October 23, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Dismissal of Defendant Ford Motor Company Ohama Service Center. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/23/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
September 24, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by WebBank. Response due 10/30/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoelting v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Stoelting
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Carlton Robinson
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri Counties Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Represented By: Alexander Marcus Porcaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?