Anderson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tim Anderson
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Advanta Bank Corp., American Express Company, Onpoint Community Credit Union and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv03858
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause filed on March 8, 2016 (Dkt. No. 59 ), is DISCHARGED and the hearing scheduled for March 17, 2016, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/10/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Accordingly, the parties are ordered to appear before the Honorable Edward J. Davila on March 17, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 1, 5th Floor, United States District Court, 280 S. First Street, San Jose, California, 9511 3, to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions, including monetary sanctions or dismissal of this action, on the parties, or any of them, for willful disobedience of a court order. The parties may file a response t o this order demonstrating good cause why sanctions should not be imposed on or before March 11, 2016. In doing so, however, they must (1) explain their failure to comply with the original deadline to file one of the ADR forms, and (2) must also file one of the forms contemplated by the February 24th Order. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/8/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 56 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to OnPoint Community Credit Union filed by Tim Anderson. Onpoint Community Credit Union terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. Response due 1/21/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/8/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 35 AMENDED Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Tim Anderson as to Defendant American Express. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/18/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal(of Defendant American Express Company) filed by Tim Anderson. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Tim Anderson. Advanta Bank Corp. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Anderson
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferguson
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanta Bank Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onpoint Community Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?