Wade v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tonetta Wade
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Acceptance Now, LLC, Boeing Employee Credit Union, Springleaf Financial Services, Inc., TD Bank USA, National Association, Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Barclay's Bank Delaware, HSBC Holdings PLC, Kohl's Corporation, Escallate, LLC, International Computer Systems, Inc., Stellar Recovery, Inc., Transworld Systems, Inc. and Bryant, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv03862
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. The parties are ordered to appear before on 10/6/2016 at 10:00 AM to show cause why the case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). On or before 9/29/2016, the parties shall file a joint statement in response to the Order to Show Cause. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/31/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 2, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court *** DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY *** please see 108 ORDER re 106 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Stellar Recovery, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/2/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016) Modified on 8/2/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. 1.The parties shall comply with the deadlines provided in the Case Management Order filed on 1/26/2016 87 . 2.The parties shall complete mediation by the deadline provided in the order filed on 6/17/2016 99 . 3.The Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/4/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
June 21, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A)(1), granting 101 . Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/21/2016. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 20, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED and the hearing scheduled for 5/26/2016 is VACATED.The court schedules this action for a Status Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 6/23/2016. The parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement on or before 6/16/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/20/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 12, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are ordered to appear on 5/26/2016 at 10:00 a.m. to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions for willful disobedience of a court order. The parties may file a response to this order demonstrating good cause why sanctions should not be imposed on or before 5/19/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/12/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
January 5, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DISMISSING DEFENDANTS. Plaintiff filed a return to the OSC on December 28, 2015, in which she demonstrated completion of service on Kohls Corporation. Accordingly, the OSC is DISCHARGED as to that defendant. However, Plaintiff has not demonstrated service on Verizon Communications, Inc., HSBC Holdings PLC, Escallate, LLC, or Bryant, Inc., and admits that such service was not completed. Accordingly, all claims against these defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/5/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 18, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court issues the instant OSC requiring that Plaintiff, no later than 12/28/2015 either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendants; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/18/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
October 9, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 48 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant Acceptance Now) filed by Tonetta Wade. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/9/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
September 24, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Tonetta Wade. Springleaf Financial Services, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonetta Wade
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acceptance Now, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Employee Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Austin Benjamin Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: David Ian Dalby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclay's Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escallate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Computer Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Issa Kalani Moe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellar Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?