Khek v. Colvin et al

Defendant: Sokha Khek and Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2015cv03902
Filed: August 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 36 Stipulation awarding fees and costs pursuant to the Equal Justice Act.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
February 8, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Remanding for further proceedings. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
June 28, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 22 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to file brief in support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 7, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/7/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
January 15, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DISSOLVING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND (2) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/15/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
December 30, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/27/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/30/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khek v. Colvin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sokha Khek
Represented By: Geri Nadine Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?